+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:54PM.
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:08PM.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (7)
April 3, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
February 19, 2018: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 19, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
February 15, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 8, 2018: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 8, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor