+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 134 rfe
- Action: Signed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:40 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (6)
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
February 26, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 26, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2015: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 12, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor