+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:45PM.
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 28, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 10:11AM.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2023: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 27, 2023: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 14
February 27, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 13, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 10, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 10, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor