+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- FI (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass amended.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
Financial Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
January 28, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 28, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 11, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
January 11, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor