+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:59PM.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Banking and Financial Services Committee: do pass.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- FI (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Financial Institutions Committee: do pass amended.
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Financial Institutions Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Financial Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 16, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
March 16, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
February 17, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2016: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2016: House Banking and Financial Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2016: Senate Financial Institutions Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 11, 2016: Financial Institutions: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor