+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- HEALTH - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- SUB Motion to Retain on Calendar: Passed
- HEALTH - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend #1 - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend #3 - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend #4 - passed
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 5:24PM.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Barto flr amend (ref HHS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
May 4, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
May 4, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 2, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 28, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 2, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor