+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
January 25, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 25, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 22, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 8, 2018: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor