+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Amendment: HCR 2065 passed as amended by s/v 28-27
- Amendment: Floor Amend to Concurrent Res - Sinema - passed by s/v 28-27
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Committee of the Whole:
On March 25, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendment
Sinema Floor amendment, reference to printed concurrent resolution
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 14, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor