+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
On March 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Amendment passed: WM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2010: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
February 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1