+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Con Res - Stevens
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Stevens Floor Amendment; Reference to printed concurrent resolution
House Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Stevens Floor Amendment; Reference to printed concurrent resolution
House Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-13 fin_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 23, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3