+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: H
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Consent calendar: 2:00 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Votes (2)
February 15, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor