+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
- Third read: Failed
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment: Bill passed amended on RCV 31-28-1
- Amendment: Bill failed on s/v 27-29
- Amendment passed: APPROP
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Government: Withdrawn
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2008: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
February 21, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor