+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate first read
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:00 pmobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2010: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
March 29, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 4
February 15, 2010: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor