+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Senate second read
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 19, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: CMMA - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to CMMA - Nelson
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Nelson Floor Amendment, reference to the COUNTIES, MUNICIPALITIES AND MILITARY AFFAIRS Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Nelson Floor Amendment, reference to the COUNTIES, MUNICIPALITIES AND MILITARY AFFAIRS Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 28, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 26, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
February 13, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor