+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
- Amendment passed: TRANS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions and Insurance
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 31, 2007: Financial Institutions and Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2007: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor