+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: withdrawn.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Amended by APPROP - replaced by substitute
- Third read in House: PASSED
- SUB Floor Amend to APPROP - Kavanagh - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Second read in House.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2021: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 4, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 22, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
February 22, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor