+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2010: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 25, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor