+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Dial flr amend (ref Res) adopted
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- GHE - passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (5)
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Dial flr amend (ref Res) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 7, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor