+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:32AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House Elections Committee: do pass.
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2020: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 12, 2020: House Elections Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
February 12, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor