+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 51
May 6, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 9
April 12, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
April 12, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 14, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 16, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
February 16, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
January 19, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor