+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Federal Relations Committee: do pass.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federal Relations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
February 5, 2019: House Federal Relations Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 5, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor