+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- NREW - passed
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 13
March 6, 2019: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
February 12, 2019: House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
February 12, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor