+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- GHE - passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 7, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
March 7, 2016: State Debt and Budget Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate State Debt and Budget Reform Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
February 4, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 4, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 4, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 4, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor