+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Failed
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Transmit to House.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Res) adopted
- Hobbs #1 flr amend (ref APPROP) failed
- Hobbs #2 flr amend (ref APPROP) failed
- Hobbs #3 flr amend (ref APPROP) failed
- Yee flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- Quezada flr amend (ref APPROP) failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- To include the Hobbs #1 ref Approp
- To include the Hobbs #3 ref Approp
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Thorpe moved that the House reconsider HCR 2014 Thursday, February 25th 2016. Motion passed v/v.
- Third read in House: Failed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass.
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (13)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 6, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 50
May 6, 2016: House final read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 50
- Present/NV: 4
April 28, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
March 17, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 17, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 25, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 28
February 18, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 3
January 19, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 19, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor