+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2013: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor