+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Senate first read
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 1:59 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 29, 2013: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 29, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1