+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Elections Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Elections Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
January 21, 2016: Elections: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Elections Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7