+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:15 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On February 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-12 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
February 20, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2007: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 16, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor