+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 6:21 pm
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
January 30, 2012: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 30, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor