+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 11, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2