+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted version: House engrossed version
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Transmit to House
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Senate first read
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Con Mem - Patterson
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:31 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Energy and Natural Resources
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-21 bsfss
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
March 10, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2011: Energy and Natural Resources: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 1, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor