+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- House Federal Relations Committee: do pass.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Federal Relations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
February 11, 2020: House Federal Relations Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor