+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
February 3, 2021: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 14
February 3, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor