+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 25
February 8, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Thomas R. Shope
Type:
Primary Sponsor