+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- HJR 2002 substituted for SJR 1003. Motion carried.: Passed
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:18PM.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 21, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
February 2, 2017: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor