+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-18 hhs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 23, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 20, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor