+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
On June 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On June 24, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On June 23, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
June 26, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
June 23, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
June 23, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor