+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 8, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor