+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate second read
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 10:00 am
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-16 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-4 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 26, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 24, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 2
February 21, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor