+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
- Final disposition: None
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Waring flr amend (ref Res)
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:57 pmobject
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 11:00 am
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Waring Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed resolution
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-26 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
Waring Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed resolution
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-21 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 3, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 7, 2007: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
February 6, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor