+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Third read: Unanimously adopted
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:00 pm
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor