+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 3, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 3, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 3, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor