+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- APPROP (ref Res) adopted
- Shooter flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
- Second read in Senate.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Shooter flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 26, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
April 26, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 24, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
January 26, 2016: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 26, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 26, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7