+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture, Water and Lands
- House first read
+ − Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 16, 2015: Agriculture, Water and Lands: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 16, 2015: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor