+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Third read in Senate: UA
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Third read in House: UA
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:00PM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (2)
February 7, 2023: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 7, 2023: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor