+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to Secretary of State.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- FSR - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
Federalism and States' Rights
House Proposed Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 31, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 31, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 16, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 16, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 26, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 5
January 26, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor