+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Government & Elections Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government & Elections Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
February 8, 2021: House Government & Elections Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 6
February 8, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor