+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:03 pm
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Banking and Financial Services: Do pass
- House second read
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Financial Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2015: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 9, 2015: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor