+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Secretary of state
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pm
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Water, Land Use and Rural Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: MAPS
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
3-12 wlrd
Senate Fact Sheet
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 22, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 6, 2012: Water, Land Use and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 25, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor