+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Con Res - Lovas
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Con Res - Contreras
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Contreras Floor Amendment; Reference to printed resolution
House Adopted Amendment
Contreras Floor Amendment; Reference to printed resolution
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2014: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 7
February 11, 2014: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor